Senate | 06/01/2017 | File Number 820 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 565 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8010 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | File Number 219 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | House Calendar Number 172 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |