House | 05/11/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | File Number 259 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | House Calendar Number 199 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/07/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |