House
|
07/05/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2017
|
Public Act 17-119
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
File Number 726
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 418
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6561
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
File Number 70
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
House Calendar Number 82
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|