House | 05/15/2017 | File Number 763 | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | House Calendar Number 508 | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/07/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |