House
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2017
|
Special Act 17-18
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
File Number 720
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 394
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6558
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
File Number 349
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
House Calendar Number 261
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|