Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06813 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/24/2017

                            General Assembly  Proposed Bill No. 6813
January Session, 2017  LCO No. 2338
 *02338*
Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
Introduced by:
REP. ROJAS, 9th Dist.

General Assembly

Proposed Bill No. 6813 

January Session, 2017

LCO No. 2338

*02338*

Referred to Committee on EDUCATION 

Introduced by:

REP. ROJAS, 9th Dist.

AN ACT ESTABLISHING A MINIMUM SCHOOL DISTRICT SIZE.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

That title 10 of the general statutes be amended to (1) define "small school district" as a school district with an average daily membership, as defined in section 10-261 of the general statutes, of less than one thousand pupils, (2) reduce the equalization aid grant for a small district by (A) twenty-five per cent for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020, (B) fifty per cent for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021, (C) seventy-five per cent for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, and (D) one hundred per cent for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023, except that no such reductions shall occur for any small district that consolidates with another school district, and (3) require the Department of Education to provide, within available appropriations, support and financial assistance for the costs associated with any small district consolidation.

Statement of Purpose: 

To encourage regionalization and efficiency by establishing a minimum school district size.