House | 05/05/2017 | File Number 727 | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 412 | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 6658 | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6675 | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | File Number 178 | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | House Calendar Number 147 | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing | ||
House | 03/01/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/31/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |