House
|
07/07/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2017
|
Public Act 17-171
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 399
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
File Number 180
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
House Calendar Number 149
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2017
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|