House | 07/10/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/20/2017 | Public Act 17-181 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 613 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | File Number 260 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | House Calendar Number 200 | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/07/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |