House | 07/10/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/20/2017 | Public Act 17-183 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 374 | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | File Number 500 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | House Calendar Number 341 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/08/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |