House | 04/11/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | File Number 285 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | House Calendar Number 215 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/10/2017 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |