House | 05/03/2017 | File Number 714 | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | File Number 46 | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 64 | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 01/30/2017 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
House | 01/27/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |