House | 03/02/2017 | File Number 6 | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | House Calendar Number 34 | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/01/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/15/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
House | 01/31/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |