House | 03/30/2017 | File Number 319 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | House Calendar Number 234 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |