House | 05/11/2017 | File Number 751 | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 438 | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6241 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | File Number 224 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | House Calendar Number 176 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |