House | 03/28/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | File Number 26 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | House Calendar Number 54 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |