House | 03/08/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |