House | 05/10/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | File Number 587 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 389 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/03/2017 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
House | 02/02/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |