Senate
|
06/30/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2017
|
Public Act 17-125
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
File Number 813
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 551
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6132
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
File Number 125
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
House Calendar Number 120
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|