House | 07/05/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/21/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/16/2017 | Public Act 17-123 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | File Number 784 | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 486 | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7081 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | File Number 28 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | House Calendar Number 56 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/21/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |