House | 06/07/2017 | Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 621 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | File Number 29 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | House Calendar Number 57 | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/08/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |