House
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Public Act 17-187
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
File Number 686
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 371
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6210
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
File Number 127
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
House Calendar Number 122
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|