Senate | 06/02/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 568 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/02/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8032 | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | File Number 184 | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | House Calendar Number 153 | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |