House | 06/06/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | Public Act 17-27 | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 403 | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | File Number 73 | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | House Calendar Number 85 | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/10/2017 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |