House
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Public Act 17-176
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
File Number 752
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 440
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6294
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
File Number 89
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
House Calendar Number 92
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|