House
|
07/11/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Public Act 17-175
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
File Number 778
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 476
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7038
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
File Number 90
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
House Calendar Number 93
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|