House | 03/14/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Planning and Development | ||
House | 02/10/2017 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 02/09/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |