House
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Public Act 17-177
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 473
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
File Number 716
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
File Number 187
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
House Calendar Number 156
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|