House | 07/10/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/26/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/20/2017 | Public Act 17-179 | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 485 | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | File Number 128 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | House Calendar Number 123 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |