House
|
07/10/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Public Act 17-189
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
File Number 785
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 489
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7421
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7365
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
File Number 129
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
House Calendar Number 124
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|