Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07108 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/16/2017

                            General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 7108
January Session, 2017  LCO No. 4010
 *04010_______GL_*
Referred to Committee on GENERAL LAW
Introduced by:
(GL)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 7108 

January Session, 2017

LCO No. 4010

*04010_______GL_*

Referred to Committee on GENERAL LAW 

Introduced by:

(GL)

AN ACT CONCERNING COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGERS.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Section 20-453 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2017):

(a) Upon receipt of a completed application and the appropriate fees, the department, upon authorization of the commission, shall: (1) Issue and deliver to the applicant a certificate of registration; or (2) refuse to issue the certificate. The commission may suspend, revoke or refuse to issue or renew any certificate issued under sections 20-450 to 20-462, inclusive, or may place a registrant on probation or issue a letter of reprimand for any of the reasons stated in section 20-456. No application for the reinstatement of a certificate which has been revoked shall be accepted by the department within one year after the date of such revocation.

(b) Any person issued an initial certificate of registration on or after October 1, 2012, but prior to October 1, 2017, shall, not later than one year following the date of issuance of such certificate, successfully complete a nationally recognized course on community association management and pass the National Board of Certification for Community Association Managers' Certified Manager of Community Associations examination, or a similar examination as may be prescribed by the Commissioner of Consumer Protection in regulations adopted pursuant to subsection [(d)] (e) of this section.

(c) Any person who is a holder of a certificate of registration issued prior to October 1, 2012, who has held such certificate for (1) less than ten years shall, on or before October 1, 2014, successfully complete a nationally recognized course on community association management and pass the National Board of Certification for Community Association Managers' Certified Manager of Community Associations examination, or a similar examination as may be prescribed by the Commissioner of Consumer Protection in regulations adopted pursuant to subsection [(d)] (e) of this section, or (2) ten years or more shall, on or before October 1, 2014, successfully complete a nationally recognized course on community association management.

(d) On or after October 1, 2017, prior to applying for a certificate of registration, an applicant shall successfully complete a nationally recognized course on community association management and pass the National Board of Certification for Community Association Managers' Certified Manager of Community Associations examination, or a similar examination, as may be prescribed by the commissioner in regulations adopted pursuant to subsection (e) of this section.

[(d)] (e) The department, with the advice and assistance of the commission, shall adopt regulations, in accordance with chapter 54, concerning any examination required for certification under this chapter and the approval of schools, institutions or organizations offering courses in current practices and laws concerning community association management and the content of such courses. Such regulations shall include, but not be limited to: (1) Specifications for meeting the educational requirements prescribed in this section; and (2) exemptions from the educational requirements for reasons of health or instances of individual hardship. In adopting such regulations, the department may not disapprove a school, institution or organization that offers an examination or courses in current practices and laws concerning community association management solely because its examination or courses are offered or taught by electronic means, nor may the department disapprove an examination or course solely because it is offered or taught by electronic means. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2017 20-453

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2017

20-453

Statement of Purpose: 

To ensure community association managers have completed a nationally recognized course and passed an examination prior to applying for a certificate of registration. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]