House | 04/04/2017 | File Number 392 | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | House Calendar Number 287 | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |