House | 04/17/2017 | File Number 630 | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 349 | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6145 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | File Number 131 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | House Calendar Number 126 | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/17/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |