House
|
06/06/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Public Act 17-28
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
File Number 481
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 262
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5968
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
File Number 134
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
House Calendar Number 129
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|