House
|
05/25/2017
|
File Number 793
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 525
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7565
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 7122
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Bill Passed Temporary
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 7122
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
File Number 189
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
House Calendar Number 158
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|