House
|
06/20/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2017
|
Public Act 17-55
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
File Number 808
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 547
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7854
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
File Number 230
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
House Calendar Number 182
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|