House | 04/12/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | No New File by Committee on Environment | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | File Number 289 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | House Calendar Number 219 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |