House | 04/04/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | File Number 291 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | House Calendar Number 221 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |