Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
Public Act 17-192
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
File Number 814
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 556
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8085
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
File Number 430
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
House Calendar Number 303
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|