House | 04/21/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 380 | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | File Number 292 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | House Calendar Number 222 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |