House | 04/12/2017 | File Number 547 | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | House Calendar Number 362 | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |