House | 06/06/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/31/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/30/2017 | Public Act 17-29 | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 257 | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | File Number 233 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | House Calendar Number 184 | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |