House
|
06/30/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2017
|
Public Act 17-143
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
File Number 772
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 457
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6878
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
File Number 456
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
House Calendar Number 317
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|