House | 03/16/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Transportation | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |