House | 03/28/2017 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | File Number 101 | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | House Calendar Number 103 | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/02/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |