House | 05/22/2017 | File Number 788 | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 491 | ||
House | 05/22/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7376 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | File Number 294 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | House Calendar Number 224 | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/24/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |