House | 05/11/2017 | File Number 753 | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 433 | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6809 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | File Number 507 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | House Calendar Number 347 | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |