House | 03/30/2017 | File Number 346 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | House Calendar Number 246 | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/16/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/03/2017 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |