House
|
06/30/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2017
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2017
|
Public Act 17-96
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2017
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
File Number 795
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 530
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7610
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
File Number 333
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
House Calendar Number 249
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|