House | 06/30/2017 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2017 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2017 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/15/2017 | Public Act 17-98 | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2017 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 535 | ||
House | 05/25/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2017 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | File Number 591 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | House Calendar Number 393 | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |